CA AB1516 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 12804.9 and 34601 of, and to add and repeal Section 2429.6 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: driver's license requirements: farming

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-25 In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
2012-05-25 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2012-05-16 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2012-05-09 In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2012-04-26 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-04-25 Read second time and amended.
2012-04-24 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23).
2012-04-18 Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-04-17 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2012-04-09 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-03-19 Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-03-15 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2012-01-26 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-01-17 From printer. May be heard in committee February 16.
2012-01-13 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code12804.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code2429.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code34500.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code34601Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback