CA AB1516 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1054.3 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: discovery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1516 LIEU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1516 Lieu By Benoit (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1516 LIEU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 297, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2009-09-10 Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
2009-09-02 Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2889.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2912.)
2009-09-01 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-08-31 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2010.)
2009-07-16 Read second time, amended, and to third reading.
2009-07-15 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 7).
2009-06-29 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-06-11 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-05-27 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-26 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1663.)
2009-05-14 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-05-13 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 12).
2009-04-21 Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-04-20 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2009-04-02 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1516&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20090227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20090420_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20090629_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20090716_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20090908_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20090512_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20090526_1215PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20090707_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20090831_0438PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1516_vote_20090902_0228PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback