CA AB1515 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 8.2 (commencing with Section 65458) of Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 7 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Planning and zoning: community plans: review under the California Environmental Quality Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1515 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1515 Friedman By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1515 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1515 Friedman By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1515 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2837.). |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2239.). |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 1520.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 29). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65458 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |