CA AB1515 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 378, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 378, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65589.5 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Planning and zoning: housing.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - AB 1515 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1515 Daly By Atkins (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1515 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1515 Daly By Atkins (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1515 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 378, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 4. Page 3515.). |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3507.) |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2963.). |
2017-07-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 10). |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65589.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |