CA AB1515 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 4450.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: Electronic Lien and Title (ELT) Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-08-20 - Assembly - AB 1515 ENG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-16 - Senate - Special Consent #13 AB1515 Eng (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1515 ENG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-10-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 540, Statutes of 2009.
2009-10-11 Approved by the Governor.
2009-09-25 Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2009-09-08 Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
2009-08-27 Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
2009-08-20 Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2656.)
2009-07-16 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2009-07-16 Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1767.)
2009-07-09 Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
2009-07-07 Read second time. To third reading.
2009-07-06 From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2009-06-25 Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-06-24 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23).
2009-06-11 Referred to Com. on T. & H.
2009-05-28 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2009-05-28 Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1769.)
2009-05-26 Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
2009-05-21 From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 20).
2009-04-30 Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-04-29 Read second time and amended.
2009-04-28 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 27).
2009-04-15 Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2009-04-14 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2009-04-13 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1515&sess=0910&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20090227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20090414_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20090429_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20090625_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20090825_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_bill_20091011_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20090427_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20090520_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20090528_0152PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20090623_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20090716_1113AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1515_vote_20090820_1017AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback