CA AB1509 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7282.5 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 190, 422.75, 667.5, 667.61, 1170.11, 1174.4, 1203.06, 1269b, 2962, 3057, 12022.2, 12022.53, 12022.55, and 12022.8 of, to add Section 1170.23 to, and to repeal Sections 12021.5, 12022, 12022.4, and 12022.5 of, the Penal Code, relating to enhancements.
Title
Enhancements: firearms.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7282.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1174.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12021.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022.53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022.55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 12022.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1269 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2962 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3057 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 422.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 667.61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |