CA AB1508 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 49550.6 to the Education Code, relating to pupil nutrition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil nutrition: Breakfast After the Bell Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code47605Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code49550.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback