CA AB1507 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 832.35 to the Penal Code, relating to peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officers: training.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1507 L.& E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-11-30SenateFrom Senate committee without further action.
2015-07-16SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
2015-07-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-07-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-07-09SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2015-06-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-22SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2015-06-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-28SenateReferred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2015-05-14SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1451.)
2015-05-07AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2015-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
2015-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. & E.
2015-04-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2015-03-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
2015-03-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code47605.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code47612.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52052.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52302.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code52520Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code53082Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code69439Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code84830Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code88640Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code1091.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code12803.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code95501Amended CodeCitation Text
Labor Code999.80Amended CodeCitation Text
Military and Veterans Code14403Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code832.35New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code10200Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code10204Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code10205Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code11024Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code1177.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code1269Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code1279.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14002Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14003Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14004.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14005Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14013Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14020Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14200Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14206Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14208Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14211Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14221Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14230Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14231Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14500Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code18002Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code18008Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code2051Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code320.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code325.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code9600.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code9809.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code4658.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16522.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1507&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1507_bill_20150304_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1507_bill_20150416_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1507_bill_20150709_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1507_bill_20150713_amended_sen_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1507_vote_20150422_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1507_vote_20150506_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1507_vote_20150514_1112AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1501-1550/ab_1507_vote_20150610_000001_sen_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback