CA AB1506 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 328, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 328, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2783 of the Labor Code, relating to private employment.
Title
Worker status: employees and independent contractors: newspaper distributors and carriers.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1506 Kalra Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1506 Kalra By Cortese (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1506 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1506 Kalra By Cortese (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1506 Kalra Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 328, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 3114.). |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 10). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2504.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 1709.) |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 22). |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2783 | Amended Code | Citation Text |