CA AB1506 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 326, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 12525.3 to the Government Code, relating to the Department of Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police use of force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1506 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1506 McCarty et al. By Dodd (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Assembly - AB 1506 McCarty Third Reading Urgency (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 326, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-14AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2020-08-31AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 0.).
2020-08-31AssemblyOrdered to the unfinished business file.
2020-08-31AssemblyAction rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-08-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-08-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 20).
2020-08-19SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-17SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 12).
2020-08-07SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-17SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-21SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-01-21AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3849.).
2020-01-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-15AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-01-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 13).
2020-01-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-01-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-01-06AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 3731.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-17AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12525.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback