CA AB1504 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 76060.5 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: student representation fee: statewide community college student organization: goals.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-08-26 - Assembly - AB 1504 Medina Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 12 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1504 Medina By Leyva (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1504 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1504 Medina By Leyva (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1504 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2836.). |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2239.). |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 1512.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 76060.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |