CA AB1503 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Hearing: Apr 22 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 447
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 913.2 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distributed energy and microgrids: policies: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code8371Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code913.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code913.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback