CA AB1500 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 48 (commencing with Section 80500) to the Public Resources Code, relating to safe drinking water, wildfire prevention, drought preparation, flood protection, extreme heat mitigation, and workforce development programs, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election of the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Safe Drinking Water, Wildfire Prevention, Drought Preparation, Flood Protection, Extreme Heat Mitigation, and Workforce Development Bond Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Measure version as amended on May 11 corrected. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 5). |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W.,P., & W. and NAT. RES. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 80500 | New Code | See Bill Text |