CA AB1500 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 22 2016 - 75% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 375 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State highways: relinquishment: Route 75.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-08-22 - AB 1500 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-16 - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1500 Atkins By Hueso (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - AB 1500 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-22AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2016-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2016-08-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2016-08-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-08-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
2016-08-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2016-06-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2016-06-09SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2016-02-04SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2016-01-27SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2016-01-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3498.)
2016-01-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2016-01-15AssemblyWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 3426.)
2016-01-14AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2016-01-13AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2016-01-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 11).
2016-01-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2015-04-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
2015-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2015-04-16AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 15).
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and NAT. RES.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65583.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code21080.40New CodeSee Bill Text
Streets and Highways Code375Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1500&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_bill_20150227_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_bill_20150416_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_bill_20160104_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_bill_20160113_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_bill_20160621_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_bill_20160801_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_bill_20160823_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_vote_20150415_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_vote_20160111_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_vote_20160127_1125AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_vote_20160801_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_vote_20160811_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_vote_20160816_0151PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1500_vote_20160822_0334PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback