CA AB150 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 38.10, 6363.9, 6363.10, 6902.7, 17053.88.5, 17053.91, 17055, 17059.2, 23688.5, 23689, and 23691 of, to add Sections 6902.9, 6902.10, and 19551.3 to, to add and repeal Sections 17052.10, 17053.71, 17053.80, 23628, and 23629 of, and to add and repeal Part 10.4 (commencing with Section 19900) of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to repeal Section 23 of Chapter 8 of the Statutes of 2020, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Sales and Use Tax Law: Personal Income Tax Law: Corporation Tax Law: Budget Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Assembly - AB 150 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB150 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 150 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading AB150 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 150 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2205.). |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2202.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 2202.) |
2021-07-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1760.). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate Rule 29 suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1750.) |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 1658.) |
2021-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 1627.) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 486.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |