CA AB1499 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 212, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 212, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6829 of, and to add Section 6826.5 to, the Public Contract Code, and to amend Section 91.2 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: design-build: highways.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent AB1499 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1499 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1499 Daly Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 212, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2245.). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 15). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1790.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 6826.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 6829 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 91.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |