CA AB1499 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 798, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-6)
Status: Passed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 798, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19620.15 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Horse racing: state-designated fairs: allocation of revenues: gross receipts for sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1499 Gray Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1499 Gray et al. By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1499 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1499 Gray et al. By Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1499 GRAY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 798, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3320.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2770.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1974.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 26). |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 19620.15 | New Code | See Bill Text |