CA AB1496 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 680, 680.3, and 13823.14 of, and to add and repeal Section 680.5 of, the Penal Code, relating to sexual assault.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual assault: evidence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-04-24AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code13823.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code680Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code680.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code680.5Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback