CA AB1496 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1).
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 39731 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Methane emissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-07-01 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - AB 1496 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1).
2015-06-11SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2015-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-06-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2015-06-01AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 28).
2015-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-03-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2015-03-02AssemblyRead first time.
2015-03-01AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 31.
2015-02-27AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39731New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code42100New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback