CA AB1494 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14291 of, and to repeal Section 14276 of, the Elections Code, relating to voting.
Title
Voting: marked ballots.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Assembly - AB 1494 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1494 Levine By Anderson (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1494 Levine By Anderson (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1494 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1494 Levine By Anderson (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1494 Levine By Anderson (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1494 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 15. Page 6026.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 4975.). |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Held at Desk. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 4724.). |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2016-06-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 3503.) |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (January 21). |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held without recommendation. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and REV. & TAX. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 14276 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18564 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18564.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12179.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 85500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |