CA AB1492 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5002.9 to the Public Resources Code, relating to public resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public resources: San Onofre State Beach: Richard and Donna O’Neill Conservancy: road construction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1492 Boerner Horvath Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-08SenateReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1405.)
2019-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22).
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5002.9New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback