CA AB1491 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 519, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 519, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 84901 and 84914 of the Education Code, relating to adult education.
Title
Adult education: consortia: carryover of allocated funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-24 - Assembly - AB 1491 McCarty Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1491 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Assembly - AB 1491 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Senate - Special Consent AB1491 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Assembly - AB 1491 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 519, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4984.). |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-01-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 3308.) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member McCarty. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member McCarty. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 84901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 84914 | Amended Code | Citation Text |