CA AB1490 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 3162 and 3163 to the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: well stimulation treatments: seismic activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 27). |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3162 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3163 | New Code | See Bill Text |