CA AB1487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 6.8 (commencing with Section 64500) to the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

San Francisco Bay area: housing development: financing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1487 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1487 Chiu et al. By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1487 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 41. Noes 27. Page 3518.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2775.).
2019-09-06SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 6)
2019-09-05SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-09-05SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-09-04SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (September 4)
2019-08-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on HOUSING pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-08-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-08-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-19SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-11SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10).
2019-07-03SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-06-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 21. Page 1986.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24).
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code64500New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback