CA AB1487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 6.8 (commencing with Section 64500) to the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
San Francisco Bay area: housing development: financing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1487 Chiu Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1487 Chiu et al. By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1487 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1487 Chiu et al. By Wiener (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-06 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1487 Chiu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 21 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 598, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 41. Noes 27. Page 3518.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 2775.). |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (September 6) |
2019-09-05 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | From committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (September 4) |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10). |
2019-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 21. Page 1986.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 24). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 64500 | New Code | See Bill Text |