CA AB1486 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21168.10 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |