CA AB1486 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-31 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 153, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 33704, 34008, 35016, 35221, and 36806 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to milk products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Milk products: licenses: fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1486 Caballero By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1486 CABALLERO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-31 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 153, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-31 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2017-07-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-07-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 1. Page 2077.).
2017-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-18SenateReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-05-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-04AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1378.)
2017-04-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback