CA AB1485 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 763, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 763, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 65585.01 to the Government Code, relating to housing.
Title
Housing element: enforcement: Attorney General.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Haney [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1485 Haney Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1485 Haney et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1485 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1485 Haney et al. By Wiener (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1485 Haney Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 763, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 3435.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 2661.). |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 2122.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 10). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65585.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |