CA AB1484 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 66000.1 to the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mitigation Fee Act: housing developments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1484 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-08-19SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1772.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code66000.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback