CA AB1484 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-09 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-09 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66000.1 to the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Mitigation Fee Act: housing developments.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1484 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1484 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1772.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 66000.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |