CA AB1481 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 342, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 342, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 631 and 631.3 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 607, 1719, 1719.5, 1769, and 1771 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public safety, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1481 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1481 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1481 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1481 Committee on BUDGET (Blumenfield) (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1481 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 342, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:40 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6546.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 4903.). | |
2012-08-24 | From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 23). Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-23 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-08-22 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-07-02 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-07 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-03-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4091.) | |
2012-03-19 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2012-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2012-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |