CA AB1479 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 63044, 63045, and 63046 of the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opportunity Zone Credit Enhancement Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2019-04-22AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2019-04-08AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2).
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code63044Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63045Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code63046Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback