CA AB1472 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6804 of the Public Resources Code, relating to public lands.
Title
Public lands: assignments and transfers: oil, gas, and mineral leases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1472 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1472 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 1472 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-11 | Stricken from file. | |
2017-08-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-07-24 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2017-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:40 p.m. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1844.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 1526.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 3). |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 17). |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6804 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 6819 | Amended Code | Citation Text |