CA AB1469 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 23 Assembly Appropriations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 8050 of, and to add Section 8051 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to court reporters, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court reporters: registration: nonshorthand reporting corporation entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2020-01-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-09-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2019-09-13AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on P. & C.P.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code8050Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code8051New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback