CA AB1469 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22140, 22141, 22905, 22955, and 22955.5 of, to add Sections 22002.5, 22901.7, 22957, and 22958 to, and to add and repeal Sections 22311.9, 22950.5, and 22955.1 of, the Education Code, relating to state teachers' retirement, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State teachers' retirement: Defined Benefit Program: funding.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Sen. Norma Torres [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-15 - Assembly - AB 1469 BONTA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB1469 Bonta By Torres (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1469 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB1469 Bonta By Torres (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1469 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 5533.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 5533.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 5533.). |
2014-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 15). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3904.). |
2014-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 3784.) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 5073.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 19. Page 4818.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 22002.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22141 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22311.9 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22901.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22950.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22955 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22955.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22955.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 22957 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 22958 | New Code | See Bill Text |