CA AB1466 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 359, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 359, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 12956.1, 12956.2, 27282, and 27388.1 of, and to add Sections 12956.3 and 27388.2 to, the Government Code, relating to real property.
Title
Real property: discriminatory restrictions.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Autumn Burke [D] |
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Asm. Jose Medina [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1466 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1466 McCarty et al. By Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1466 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1466 McCarty et al. By Rubio (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1466 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 359, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 3073.). |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3063.) |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2568.). |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1718.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and INS. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 1. Page 1895.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12956.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12956.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 27282 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27388.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 27388.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |