CA AB1466 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-27 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69999.6 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 3020, 4103, and 15372 of the Elections Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Budget Act of 2012: Governor's Scholarship Programs:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1466 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1466 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-08-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-07-02 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (June 26). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-06-07 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-03-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4083.) | |
2012-03-19 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2012-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2012-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |