CA AB1461 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 11.2 (commencing with Section 114364) to Part 7 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to food.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food facility employee: food handler cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1461 Thurmond By Newman (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1461 THURMOND Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11 Vetoed by Governor.
2017-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2342.).
2017-08-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-07-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-06-05SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 2051.)
2017-05-31AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 1990.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1775.)
2017-05-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-17AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code113789Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code114364New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback