CA AB146 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6539.5 of the Government Code, and to add Section 104.20 to the Streets and Highways Code, relating to state highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State highways: property leases: County of Orange.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
2019-01-07AssemblyRead first time.
2018-12-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 14.
2018-12-14AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code6539.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code104.20New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback