CA AB1459 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 189.1 to the Penal Code, relating to murder.
Title
Murder: peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-21 - Assembly - AB 1459 QUIRK-SILVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1459 Quirk-Silva et al. By Newman (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1459 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1459 Quirk-Silva et al. By Newman (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Assembly - AB 1459 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 214, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-08-21 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2681.). |
2017-07-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 19 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-07-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2076.). |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1301.) |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 189 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 189.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 190 | Amended Code | Citation Text |