CA AB1459 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 31495) to Division 17 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Toll lanes: County of Orange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 2 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 31495 | New Code | See Bill Text |