CA AB1457 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4435.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 13997.3 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional business training center network: pilot project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1457 Cervantes Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1457 Cervantes et al. By Leyva (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1457 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-29 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4435.).
2020-09-30 Vetoed by Governor.
2020-09-08AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2020-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5379.).
2020-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2020-08-30AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5274.)
2020-08-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2020-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2020-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.).
2020-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2020-08-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-08-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-07-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2020-06-30SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-30SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2020-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and GOV. & F.
2019-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 2. Page 2015.)
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1983.)
2019-05-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 15).
2019-05-13AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.)
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 10).
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code13997.3Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback