CA AB1456 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died at Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal punishment.
Title
Crimes: sentencing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Died at Desk. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1456&sess=1516&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1456_bill_20150227_introduced.html |