CA AB1453 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 39837.5 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 545 of the Vehicle Code, relating to schoolbuses.
Title
Schoolbuses: adult volunteer transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1453 Eduardo Garcia By Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1453 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1453 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 173, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2121.). |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1619.) |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 39837.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 39837.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 545 | Amended Code | Citation Text |