CA AB1453 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 646, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 9.5 (commencing with Section 1410) to Division 6 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Southern California Veterans Cemetery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1453 QUIRK-SILVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1453 Quirk-Silva By Correa (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1453 QUIRK-SILVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 646, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2014-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2014-08-25AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6397.).
2014-08-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2014-08-21SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4702.).
2014-08-19SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2014-08-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2014-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2014-06-05SenateReferred to Com. on V.A.
2014-05-29SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5338.)
2014-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-07AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2014-04-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2014-04-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2014-01-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on V.A.
2014-01-10AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
2014-01-09AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Military and Veterans Code1410New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1453&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_bill_20140109_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_bill_20140422_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_bill_20140619_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_bill_20140804_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_bill_20140819_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_bill_20140827_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_bill_20140927_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_vote_20140429_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_vote_20140523_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_vote_20140529_1146AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_vote_20140624_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_vote_20140804_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_vote_20140814_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_vote_20140821_0141PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_1451-1500/ab_1453_vote_20140825_0155PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback