CA AB1451 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 101, 9030, and 9031 of, and to add Sections 102.5, 9009.5, 9022.5, 9036, and 9037 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Petition circulators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1451 Low Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1451 Low et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 1451 Low Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-07 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-24AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3442.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2757.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and PUB. S.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1892.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-05-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code101Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code102.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9008Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9009.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9009.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9009.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9022.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9030Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9031Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code9036New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code9037New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback