CA AB1449 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 69436 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: California Community College
Sponsors
Asm. Patty Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1449 LOPEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1449 Lopez By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Assembly - AB 1449 LOPEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1449 Lopez By Block (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Assembly - AB 1449 LOPEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6465.). |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5344.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 3478.) |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 21). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-12-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69436 | Amended Code | Citation Text |