CA AB1449 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3000.08 and 3451 of the Penal Code, relating to punishment.
Title
Realignment Omnibus Act of 2014.
Sponsors
Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Roger Hernandez [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] |
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Held without recommendation. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3000.08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3451 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |