CA AB1447 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.9 (commencing with Section 42360) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: food and beverage packaging.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 27). |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14548 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 14549 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 18050 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 40003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42360 | New Code | See Bill Text |