CA AB1440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3106 and 6830.1 of the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas: development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-05 - Assembly - AB 1440 Levine Concurrence Vote: Final Form (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1440 Levine By Monning (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1440 Levine Assembly Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21 Stricken from file.
2019-10-12 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-11AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-05AssemblyOrdered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-09-05Assembly(Ayes 47. Noes 20. Page 3033.)
2019-09-05AssemblyBill in its final form passes.
2019-09-03AssemblyVote on concurrence in final form pending.
2019-09-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-09-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2447.).
2019-08-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-19SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 21. Page 2152.)
2019-05-30AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 2149.)
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 2064.)
2019-05-22AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1828.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-04-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-25AssemblyRead first time.
2019-02-23AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
2019-02-22AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code3106Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6830.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback